MA H4051 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1803
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 442 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 442 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to counterfeit airbag prohibition
Title
Relative to counterfeit airbag prohibition
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 442 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-12-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-12-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-12-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-11-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-11-30 | House | New draft of H1803 |
2017-11-30 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1803 (Replaces) 2017-11-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4051
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4051 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4051.pdf |