MA H4044 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority to provide water services to the town of Wilmington
Title
To amend the Enabling Act of the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority to include an additional water community.
Sponsors
Rep. James Miceli [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2009-05-11 | Enacted | |
2009-05-11 | Enacted and laid before the Governor 38 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Senate Roll Call, No. 80) | |
2009-05-11 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2009-05-11 | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-05-11 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-05-04 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-05-04 | Committee recommended ought to pass and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2009-05-04 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-04-01 | Senate concurred | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H4044 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=5807&generalCourtId=2 |