MA H4037 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt residential security systems from the sales tax. Revenue.
Title
Exempting residential security systems from sales tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2016-03-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/08/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on the Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1286 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H364 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2991 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H363 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
H2501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1286 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H364 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2991 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H363 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4037 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4037.pdf |