MA H4035 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4191

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city of Greenfield be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in said city. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city of Greenfield to grant an additional liquor license for the sale of all alcohol beverages to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-20HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4191
2023-09-18JointHearing scheduled for 09/25/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2023-08-07SenateSenate concurred
2023-08-03HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H4191 (Replaced by) 2024-02-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2024
H4588 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4688
H4759 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4849
H4025 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
H4823 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback