MA H4028 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Westborough be authorized to establish a capital improvements fund in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special fund in the town of Westborough

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2018
2018-04-02SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-04-02HouseEnacted
2018-03-29SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-03-29SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-02-14SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-02-05SenateRead and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2018-02-01HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2017-12-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-12-07HouseRules suspended
2017-12-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-12-04HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-11-14SenateSenate concurred
2017-11-13HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S2156 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3688 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3758
H3992 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2018
H3758 (Similar To) 2017-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2017
S2245 (Similar To) 2018-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2018
H4444 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback