MA H4026 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H80
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a registry of caretakers found to have substantiated abuse against persons with intellectual disability or developmental disability
Title
To establish a registry of caretakers found to have substantiated abuse against persons with intellectual disability or developmental disability
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-11-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-11-13 | House | New draft of H80 |
2017-11-13 | House | Reported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H80 (Replaces) 2017-11-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4026
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H708 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H98 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H93 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4168 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H708 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H98 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H93 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4168 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4026 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4026.pdf |