MA H4018 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-27 - Accompanied a study order, H4414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-27 - Accompanied a study order, H4414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a department of environmental protection appeals board. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
ESTABLISHING A DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION APPEALS BOARD.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, H4414 |
2012-04-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2012 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-03-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2012-02-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4018 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17990&generalCourtId=1 |