MA H4017 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3890
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kane of Holyoke, for the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government, on House, No. 3890, a Bill supporting municipal fiscal stability through a special education stabilization fund (House, No. 4017). April 2, 2012.
Title
Supporting Municipal Fiscal Stability through a Special Education Stabilization Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-05-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-04-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-04-04 | House | New draft of H3890 |
2012-04-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3890 (Replaces) 2012-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4017 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=91718&generalCourtId=1 |