MA H4009 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H536
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to advancing contraceptive coverage and economic security in our state
Title
Relative to advancing contraceptive coverage and economic security in our state
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 279 (Y: 140 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-11-14 | House | Enacted |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-11-14 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-11-14 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2017-11-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2210 |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Read second |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2210 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-11-08 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 140 YEAS to 16 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 279) |
2017-11-08 | House | Read third |
2017-11-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-11-07 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-11-06 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-11-06 | House | New draft of H536 |
2017-11-06 | House | Reported from the committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H536 (Replaces) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4009
S2204 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Accompanied S2210
S2210 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - See H4009
S2204 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Accompanied S2210
S2210 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - See H4009
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4009 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4009.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov//Journal/House/190/RollCalls/hj11082017_RollCalls.pdf |