MA H4001 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1524
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Title
Relative to the establishment of a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-30 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 454 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-12-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read second, amended as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-07-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 454) |
2018-07-30 | House | Read third |
2018-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-11-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-11-06 | House | New draft of H1524, H1644, H2610 and S1506 |
2017-11-06 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1524 (Replaces) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4001
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H338 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
H4389 (Similar To) 2018-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 234 of the Acts of 2018
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1571 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H817 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H338 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
H4389 (Similar To) 2018-08-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 234 of the Acts of 2018
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4001 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4001.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov//Journal/House/190/RollCalls/hj07302018_RollCalls.pdf |