MA H4001 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a charter for the city of Northampton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
ESTABLISHING A CHARTER FOR THE CITY OF NORTHAMPTON
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4102 |
2012-05-16 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Muncipalities and Regional Government |
2012-05-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-16 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2012 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4102 (Replaced by) 2012-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4001 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=116458&generalCourtId=1 |