MA H40 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3918
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3918
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3918
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to modernizing licensing operations at the Division of Professional Licensure. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. January 7, 2013.
Title
Modernizing licensing operations at the Division of Professional Licensure
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3918 |
2013-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3918 (Replaced by) 2014-07-03 - New draft substituted, see H4254
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H40 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H40.pdf |