MA H4 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Department of the State Auditor (House, No. 3) as relates to the local mandate law (House, No. 4). Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to the local mandate law
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-03-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-03-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/29/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7791&generalCourtId=1 |