MA H3995 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1960
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the safe handling of hazardous drugs
Title
Relative to the safe handling of hazardous drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-10 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-10-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-23 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2016-02-11 | House | New draft of H1960 |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1960 (Replaces) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3995
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3701 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S1993 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2074
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3701 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S1993 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2074
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3995 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3995.pdf |