MA H3991 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the assistant clerks of the Supreme Judicial Court for Suffolk County. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the Assistant Clerks of the Supreme Judicial Court for Suffolk County
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4517 |
2023-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-07-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1426 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
S2530 (Similar To) 2023-12-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2767 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2530 (Similar To) 2023-12-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2767 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3991 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3991.pdf |