MA H3980 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4612
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require gas stations to provide air compressors for free public use. Transportation.
Title
Requiring gas stations to provide air compressors for free public use
Sponsors
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4612 |
2016-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2016 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4612 (Replaced by) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3980 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3980.pdf |