MA H3976 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Anastasios Milonopoulos, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Anastasios Milonopoulos, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3981 |
2023-07-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-07-06 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2023-06-22 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3981 (Replaced by) 2023-07-24 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4539 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4740 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
H4749 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2024
H4539 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4740 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
H4749 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3976 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3976.pdf |