MA H3968 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4187
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4187
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4187
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to clean energy resources. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to clean energy resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4187 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 15, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-03-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2014 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4187 (Replaced by) 2014-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3968 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3968.pdf |