MA H3948 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to state and municipal contracts for the purchase and installation of artificial turf fields. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Prohibiting state and municipal contracts for the purchase and installation of artificial turf fields
Sponsors
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] |
Rep. Margaret Scarsdale [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Sen. Marc Pacheco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-10-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2057 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3948 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3948.pdf |