MA H3940 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3748). October 4, 2017.
Title
Relative to the town clerk and town accountant in the town of Norwood
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-01-22 | House | Enacted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-10-04 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2017-10-04 | House | Substituted for H3748 |
Same As/Similar To
H3748 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3940
H1886 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S1984 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4185 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
H4614 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2018
H4718 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 301 of the Acts of 2018
H1886 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S1984 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4185 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4614
H4614 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2018
H4718 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 301 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3940 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3940.pdf |