MA H3937 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Canton be authorized to grant easements of certain land of said town situated in the town of Stoughton for highway purposes. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Canton to grant temporary and permanent easements of certain land of the town situated in the town of Stoughton for highway purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-02-23 | House | Amendment #1 (Walsh) adopted |
2024-02-22 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2023-10-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-10-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-10-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-07-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H786 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3937 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3937.pdf |