MA H3920 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to PANDAS/PANS screening in medical/clinical settings. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to PANDAS/PANS screening in medical/clinical settings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3920 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3920.pdf |