MA H3919 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to boat wrap recycling. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to boat wrap recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S1294 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
S449 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3097 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2533 (Similar To) 2023-12-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4263 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S449 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3097 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2533 (Similar To) 2023-12-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4263 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3919 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3919.pdf |