MA H3901 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 102 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3798). September 13, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a certain road in the town of Charlton as Trooper Thomas L. Clardy Way

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-26SenateSigned by the Governor, Chapter 102 of the Acts of 2017
2017-10-23SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2017-10-23HouseEnacted
2017-10-23SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2017-10-23HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2017-10-19SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2017-10-19SenateRules suspended
2017-10-19SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-09-14SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2017-09-13HousePassed to be engrossed
2017-09-13HouseSubstituted for H3798

Same As/Similar To

H3900 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2017

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback