MA H3891 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 252 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 252 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Salem be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Salem to grant one additional license for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises and establishing and economic development fund
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-01 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 252 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-08-22 | House | Enacted |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-06-20 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-02-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-01-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4737 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4757
H1636 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4393
H1637 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1638 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4313
H2837 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 462 of the Acts of 2016
H1636 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4393
H1637 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1638 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4313
H2837 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 462 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3891 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3891.pdf |