MA H3878 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Rebecca Paylor, an employee of the Department of Children and Families. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Rebecca Paylor, an employee of the Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-02-12 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3878 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3878.pdf |