MA H3871 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of East Bridgewater be authorized to exempt uniformed positions within the police department of said town from the civil service law. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting all uniformed positions in the police department of the town of East Bridgewater from the civil service law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-04SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-10-04JointHearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-05-22SenateSenate concurred
2023-05-18HouseReported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2023-03-27HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H3731 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H3877 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H3878 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H3999 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback