MA H3871 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Natick to enter into a certain lease agreement. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Natick to lease certain town-owned property at 20 Middlesex Avenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-07-19 | House | Enacted |
2012-07-18 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-07-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-05-09 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-03-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-03-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-03-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/29/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3871 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17785&generalCourtId=1 |