MA H3870 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representatives Robinson of Framingham and Lewis of Framingham, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Maria Duaime Robinson and Jack Patrick Lewis that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Framingham to the Claremont Realty Trust. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Commonwealth of Massachusetts to convey a certain parcel of land to the Claremont Realty Trust in the city of Framingham

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-10SenateSenate concurred
2021-05-18HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
2021-05-13HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S1357 (Similar To) 2021-08-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3178 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
H2193 (Similar To) 2021-08-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2115 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4084 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback