MA H3835 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4721
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the right of Abatement AB Initio for certain individuals. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to Odin Lloyd
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4721 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-03-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 21, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-01-30 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-01-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-07-17 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4721 (Replaced by) 2018-07-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3835 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3835.pdf |