MA H3831 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-20 - Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Canton be authorized to regulate the use of Reservoir Pond in said town. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For the regulation of Reservoir pond in the town of Canton

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-20SenateRead and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-11-16HouseRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2017-11-09HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-11-09HouseRules suspended
2017-11-09HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-11-02HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-07-21JointHearing scheduled for 07/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-1
2017-07-20SenateSenate concurred
2017-07-19HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H3761 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3817 (Similar To) 2017-08-17 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3885
H3885 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2017

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback