MA H3827 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4458
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4458
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4458
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to genetic counselors. Public Health.
Title
Relative to genetic counselors
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4458 |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-07-18 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4458 (Replaced by) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3827 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3827.pdf |