MA H3820 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3852
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3852
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3852
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Jane Mihalich, an employee of the Department of Public Health. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jane Mihalich, an employee of the Department of Public Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3852 |
2015-11-16 | House | Read third |
2015-11-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-11-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-10-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2015-10-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3852 (Replaced by) 2015-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2015
H4016 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
H3912 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
H3880 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2016
H3896 (Similar To) 2016-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 181 of the Acts of 2016
H4480 (Similar To) 2016-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2016
H4016 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
H3912 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
H3880 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2016
H3896 (Similar To) 2016-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 181 of the Acts of 2016
H4480 (Similar To) 2016-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3820 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3820.pdf |