MA H3819 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4976
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Massachusetts Credit Union Share Insurance Corporation. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to diversification of risk
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4976 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2021-05-27 | House | Returned from the Secretary of State |
2021-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
Same As/Similar To
S692 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
H3817 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3817 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3819 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3819.pdf |