MA H3800 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to notice to abutter communities of applications to the Department of Public Utilities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To ensure notice to abutter communities of applications to the department of public utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-07-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3154 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4540
S2142 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
S2531 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2142 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
S2531 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3800 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3800.pdf |