MA H3791 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Whately be authorized to continue the employment of John Lasalle as a call firefighter. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Whately to continue the employment of John Lasalle as a call firefighter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-10-11 | House | Enacted |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-09-14 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2017-08-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-08-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-08-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-07-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-07-03 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1446 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1281 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1431 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3289 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3793 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4126
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1281 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1431 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3289 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3793 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4126
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3791 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3791.pdf |