MA H3790 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4242
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the privacy of death certificates. Public Health.
Title
Relative to identity theft and the privacy of death certificates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4242 |
2015-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-09-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-09-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4242 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2727 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2475 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H2476 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4029
H1252 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2969 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2727 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2475 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H2476 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4029
H1252 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2969 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3790 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3790.pdf |