MA H3785 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 148 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the city known as the town of Franklin be authorized to establish a local agricultural commission. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the city known as the town of Franklin to establish a local agricultural commission with limited authority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-13 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 148 of the Acts of 2017
2017-12-07SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2017-12-07HouseEnacted
2017-12-04HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2017-11-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2017-11-15SenateRead third, (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed
2017-11-15SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2017-10-04SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-09-05SenateRead; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-08-31HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2017-07-26HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-07-26HouseRules suspended
2017-07-26HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-07-26HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-07-18JointHearing scheduled for 07/25/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2017-06-29SenateSenate concurred
2017-06-26HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H1412 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1
H3458 (Similar To) 2017-12-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4054
H2465 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4054 (Similar To) 2017-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback