MA H3774 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-28 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-28 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Filed by Mr. Galvin of Canton. September 28, 2015.
Title
Special procedures for consideration of the House Bill making appropriations for the Fiscal year 2015 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-28 | House | Adopted |
Same As/Similar To
H1310 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3774 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3774.pdf |