MA H3769 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3790
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3790
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3790
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act to expand the town of Hadley’s quota of liquor licenses By Mr. Scibak of South Hadley, a petition of John W. Scibak and Stanley C. Rosenberg (by vote of the town) that the town of Hadley be authorized to increase the number of licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To expand the town of Hadley’s quota of liquor licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3790 |
2013-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2013 from 04:00 PM-04:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3790 (Replaced by) 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3769 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3769.pdf |