MA H3754 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2817
Note: Legislation replaced by H3954
Note: Legislation replaced by H3954
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 432 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 432 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Dracut to grant 4 additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Dracut to grant 4 additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 432 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Re-enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Governor's amendment rejected |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-27 | House | Further amendment adopted |
2018-12-27 | House | Governor's amendment rejected |
2018-12-27 | House | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2017-10-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2017-10-16 | House | For message, see H3954 |
2017-10-12 | Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment | |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-10-04 | House | Enacted |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-09-18 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2017-06-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-06-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-06-15 | House | New draft of H2817 |
2017-06-15 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2817 (Replaces) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H3839 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2017
H3840 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2017
H3755 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2017
H3789 (Similar To) 2017-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2017
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H3954 (Replaced by) 2017-10-16 - See H3754
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H4254 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4876 (Similar To) 2018-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4908
H4908 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 351 of the Acts of 2018
H3839 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2017
H3840 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2017
H3755 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2017
H3789 (Similar To) 2017-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2017
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H3954 (Replaced by) 2017-10-16 - See H3754
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H4254 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4876 (Similar To) 2018-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4908
H4908 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 351 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3754 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3754.pdf |