MA H3737 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3735
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-31 - For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3773 for section 97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on October 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-31 - For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3773 for section 97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House bill No. 3735, as changed by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading and as amended and passed to be engrossed by the House. October 5, 2011
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal years 2011 and 2012 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-31 | House | For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3773 for section 97 |
2011-10-31 | House | For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3772 for section 8 |
2011-10-31 | House | So much as relates to the disapproval of item 4000-0500 contained in Section 2, referred, under Rule 30, to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-10-31 | House | For message, see H3774 |
2011-10-27 | House | Governor returned to the House with vetoes in disapprovals, reductions and recommendations of amendments to certain sections |
2011-10-27 | Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 142 of the Acts of 2011 | |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-10-17 | House | Enacted |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-10-17 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2011-10-17 | House | Amendment adopted |
2011-10-17 | House | House Rule 40 suspended |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-10-17 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in the further House amendment |
2011-10-14 | House | Motion to reconsider negatived |
2011-10-14 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendments, as amended |
2011-10-14 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendments with a further amendment by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 3751 |
2011-10-13 | House | House adjourned |
2011-10-13 | House | Quorum doubted |
2011-10-13 | House | Senate amendments pending |
2011-10-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #86 [36-0] |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment (Brewer) adopted |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment (Flanagan) adopted |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Motion to reconsider prevailed |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #85 [36-0] |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Read third |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Senate Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Brewer) adopted |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Pacheco) adopted |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Hedlund) adopted |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Flanagan) adopted |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Clark) adopted |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Knapik) rejected |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Hedlund) rejected - Roll Call #84 [6-30] |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #83 [5-31] |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Tarr) rejected |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Chang-Diaz) rejected |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Amendment #1 (M. Moore) rejected |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Read second |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2011-10-06 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-10-05 | House | H3735, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H3735 (Replaces) 2011-10-05 - Published as amended, see H3737
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3737 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17456&generalCourtId=1 |