MA H3734 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an Appointed Treasurer for the City of Holyoke
Title
Establishing an Appointed Treasurer for the City of Holyoke
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-09-24 | House | Enacted |
2015-09-21 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2015-09-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-08-17 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2015-08-17 | House | Substituted for H3328 |
Same As/Similar To
H3654 (Similar To) 2016-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2016
H3695 (Similar To) 2016-02-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2016
H3691 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2016
H3751 (Similar To) 2015-10-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2015
H3948 (Similar To) 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2016
H3695 (Similar To) 2016-02-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2016
H3691 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2016
H3751 (Similar To) 2015-10-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2015
H3948 (Similar To) 2016-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3734 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3734.pdf |