MA H3733 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt certain persons over the age of sixty-five from motor vehicle excises and registration fees. Revenue.
Title
To amend Chapter 60A Section 1 of the Massachusetts General Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-08-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2015-08-10 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2845 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1652 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H506 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2692 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H4744 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2016
H4745 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2016
H2845 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1652 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H506 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2692 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H4744 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2016
H4745 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3733 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3733.pdf |