MA H3728 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the recall of elected officers. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Chelmsford relative to the recall of elected officers
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Golden [D] | Rep. James Arciero [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. David Nangle [D] |
Sen. Susan Fargo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-04-09 | House | Enacted |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-03-07 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-02-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-01-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2011 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-09-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3728 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17387&generalCourtId=1 |