MA H3713 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a healthy soils program within the Department of Agricultural Resources to promote the use of regenerative agriculture. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote healthy soils

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-05-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-05-22HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
2017-05-22HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H2131 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback