MA H3687 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to headstones for long-serving or perished members of the Massachusetts National Guard. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to headstones for long-serving or perished members of the Massachusetts National Guard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2022 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2857 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2396 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2857
S1795 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2396 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2857
S1795 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3687 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3687.pdf |