MA H3682 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4474
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to property tax relief for low and moderate income seniors in the town of Brookline. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to property tax relief for low and moderate income seniors in the town of Brookline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4474 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4474 (Replaced by) 2020-05-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3682 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3682.pdf |