MA H3675 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 385 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 385 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Westwood to grant special licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages and wines and malt beverages
Title
Authorizing the town of Westwood to grant special licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages and wines and malt beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 385 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-24 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-12-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third, amended (Rush) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-02-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-02-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-02-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2012 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-08-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-08-18 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3675 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17197&generalCourtId=1 |