MA H3669 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to preserve public water supplies in Assawompset Ponds Complex communities. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To preserve public water supply in Assawompset Ponds Complex communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2012 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2012-05-14 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 15, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2011-08-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-07-21 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2011-07-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3669 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16981&generalCourtId=1 |